Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
California Avenue Investors Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Katz, Michael I., against Ellias, Paula, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions44 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1818 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (unsatisfied) filed by California Avenue Investors LLC on 02/24/2014. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and all others in possession) filed by California Avenue Investors LLC on 01/30/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of service by Posting(UD) filed by California Avenue Investors LLC on 01/30/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by California Avenue Investors LLC on 01/30/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 01/30/2014. | |
January 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by California Avenue Investors LLC on 01/30/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.