Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Zessin, Kathrine, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Wade, S. Blake, against Rojas, Elba Selene V, Garcia, Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1818 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibits destroyed. | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (fully satisfied) filed by Zessin, Kathrine on 02/10/2014. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 23, 2014 | |||
January 16, 2014 | |||
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (costs 565; atty fees 650) filed by Zessin, Kathrine on 01/16/2014. | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court Trial - Unlawful Detainer heard 01/16/2014 08:30:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.