Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collins Financial Services Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Kennard, Robert Scott, against Nickel, Phil, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time535 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (notice of entry of judgment n sister state judgment, etc.) filed by Collins Financial Services Inc on 09/11/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
November 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (notice of entry of judgment on sister state judment) filed by Collins Financial Services Inc on 11/22/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Sister State Judgment filed by Collins Financisl Services Inc on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 20. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment on Sister State Judgment filed by Collins Financisl Services Inc on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Sister state judgment. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by Collins Financisl Services Inc on 10/30/2013. Filed By: Collins Financial Services Inc(Plaintiff) Refers To: Nickel, Phil(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.