Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Palmer, James Roy filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2014 | |||
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Human Services Agency Social Worker's Report | |
March 04, 2014 | |||
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian - scheduled for 04/14/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard. | |
February 04, 2014 | |||
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian - scheduled for 03/04/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard. | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigator report finalized. | |
January 07, 2014 | |||
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Guardian - scheduled for 02/04/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard. | |
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice Of Requested Continuance Of Court Hearing Set For January 7, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom J-1 Continued To February 4, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom J-1 of The Juvenile Courthouse, 4353 Vineyard Ave., Oxnard Ca 93031 Filed By Paisley Pijuan, with Proof Of Service By Mail Attached. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.