Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Freed, Kenneth J., against Tile Trends A Corporation, Tt Commercial Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions489 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time742 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2015 |
and OSC why stay cannot be lifted as to TT Commerical Inc.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Judgment - and OSC why stay cannot be lifted as to TT Commerical Inc. scheduled for 12/02/2015 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/29/2015. | |
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment for Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc against Tile Trends a Corporation in the amount of: 20133.24 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 470.00 costs, 8522.15 pre-judgment interest, and 1000.00 attorney fees entered on 10/29/2015. | |
October 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (pursuant to CC section 1717.5) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/08/2015. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Court Judgment filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/08/2015. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re method of calculation interest) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/08/2015. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (assignment) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/08/2015. | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 10/08/2015. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.