Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Freed, Kenneth J., against Tile Trends, Tt Commercial Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions172 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time548 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court. | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 04/15/2014. | |
April 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment for Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc against Tile Trends in the amount of: 7416.34 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 355.00 costs, 587.21 pre-judgment interest, and 1412.45 attorney fees entered on 04/15/2014. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 04/07/2014. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (court judgment) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 04/07/2014. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (for Accrued Interest) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 04/07/2014. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1 to 10) filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau Inc on 04/07/2014. | |
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Tile Trends on Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.