Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hartley, Robert A., against Hancock, Lori Walker, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Anthony J. Sabo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 16, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions994 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2349 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
September 16, 2016 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 07/06/2016. | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 09/16/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2016 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 06/17/2016 08:15:00 AM. | |
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 06/17/2016 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.