Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miele, Kenneth J., against Miller, Susan A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions236 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2337 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 03/11/2020. | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 335.00, Credit to accrued interest 119.59, credit to principal 0.0, interest 7722.31) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 03/11/2020. | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 02/18/2016. | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (cost 35.00 credit 119.59 interest 2127.40) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 01/08/2016. | |
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Total Costs 335.00. Total Interest 1424.24) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 08/31/2015. | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Total: $205.00 Credit: $119.59 Interest: $1146.60) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 06/01/2015. | |
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/01/2015. | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially satisfied) filed by Unifund CCR LLC a limited liability company on 03/02/2015. | |
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.