Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chiu Flp 1, John C, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schneberg, William G., against Rochin, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1879 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Chiu FLP 1, John C on 01/21/2014. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for Chiu FLP 1, John C against Rochin, Maria in the amount of: 1650.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 575.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 11/15/2013. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated filed by Chiu FLP 1, John C on 11/15/2013. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Chiu FLP 1, John C on 11/15/2013. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 11/15/2013. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated settlement per CCP 664.6. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.