Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M., against Scolari, Debra Jean, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions170 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1272 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Bank FSB on 03/20/2014. | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by American Express Bank FSB on 01/27/2014. | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by American Express Bank FSB on 12/27/2013. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by American Express Bank FSB on 10/01/2013. Filed By: American Express Bank FSB(Plaintiff) Refers To: Scolari, Debra(Defendant) | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB on 10/01/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.