Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lee, Raymond J, against Sadorra, Ruben, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 01, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1272 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
May 05, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 05/05/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 05/02/2014. | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 05/05/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
October 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 10/15/2013. | |
October 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 43. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.