Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trujillio, Alfonso, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gutierrez, Alejandro P., against Hisson Llc A Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
CategoryOther Employment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions22 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Cycle Time1495 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
January 08, 2014 | |||
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by Trujillio, Alfonso on 09/27/2013. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Trujillio, Alfonso on 08/22/2013. | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (Served Chris Cavanaugh Manager Authorized to Accept) filed by Trujillio, Alfonso on 08/20/2013. | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Summons issued on 08/13/2013. | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Amended (1st) filed by Trujillio, Alfonso on 08/08/2013. Filed By: Trujillio, Alfonso(Plaintiff) Refers To: Hisson LLC a limited liability company(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.