Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lee, Raymond J, against Canyon Crest Ranch Partners Moorpark Llc, Jones Dds, A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1495 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 08, 2014 | |||
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express Bank FSB on 10/28/2013. | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 01/08/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by American Express Bank FSB on 09/27/2013. | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by American Express Bank FSB on 08/26/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.