Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sanchez, Christina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mckenna, Patrick T, against Guerra, Marcos, represented by Brislin, Sandra K., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
June 02, 2014 | (time estimate 7 days) | ||
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sanchez, Christina on 05/14/2014. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (time estimate 7 days) scheduled for 06/02/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 21 was vacated. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Sanchez, Christina on 05/01/2014. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Sanchez, Christina on 05/01/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.