Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Etsell, Karen L, against Glass, Greg, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2318 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 10/04/2019. | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs: $66.00, Credit: $0, Interest: $2773.34) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 06/01/2018. | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/01/2018. | |
March 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 03/06/2017. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/22/2013. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Glass, Greg on Complaint. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/22/2013. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) (Interest & Evidence Code 1550) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/22/2013. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1 to 10) filed by Midland Funding LLC on 08/22/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.