Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercado, Grecia, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Bredlau, Richard R., against West Coast Paratransit Inc, Ventura Transit System Inc, Neal, Dwayne Jermaine, represented by Duffy, John J, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial232 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1429 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1429 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | The Court orders the Complaint filed by Grecia Mercado dismissed as to Ventura Transit System Inc without prejudice. | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 04/28/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 04/28/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement heard 03/17/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 03/17/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference - /OSC Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Default Judgment as to Ventura Transit scheduled for 02/17/2017 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 02/17/2017 08:15:00 AM. | |
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Appearance Case Management Conference heard 02/17/2017 08:15:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.