Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beck, Randy, Beck, Donald F, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miller, Mark F, against Beck, Randy, Beck, Donald F, North Ranch Country Club, represented by Northrup, Linda L., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial158 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions301 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Appointment of ended. | |
May 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Status of Mediation process changed to Other on 05/15/2014. | |
May 12, 2014 |
(time estimate 5 days)
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service filed by North Ranch Country Club on 04/03/2014. | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (time estimate 5 days) scheduled for 05/12/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 41 was vacated. | |
March 27, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Per CCP 664.6) filed by Beck, Donald F; Beck, Randy on 03/27/2014. | |
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Baldwin, Wayne K. appointed as Mediator . | |
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Time and Place of Trial filed by Beck, Donald F; Beck, Randy on 11/05/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.