Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Williams, Lori N., against Munoz, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1116 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 09/13/2013. | |
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 06/25/2013. | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 21. | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/30/2013. Filed By: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Munoz, Maria(Defendant) | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Reduced Filing Fee B&P 6322.1(c)(1) filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC on 05/30/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.