Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Reyna, Mitchell Francis, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1737 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1737 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2018 | on Petition for Name Change | ||
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
January 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Proceed - on Petition for Name Change scheduled for 03/02/2018 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
October 29, 2013 | |||
August 06, 2013 | [continued from 7/23 for proof of publication] | ||
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 10/29/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura. | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Reyna, Mitchell Francis on 08/06/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.