Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moreno, Brenda, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Gonzalez, Elia, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with JoAnn Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoAnn Johnson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryHarassment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time618 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 34 effective 02/06/2015. | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS filed by Moreno, Brenda on 06/26/2013. | |
June 24, 2013 |
Judge: Rocky J. Baio |
||
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Harassment with violence (Civil Harassment) has been Granted. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 06/23/16. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Clet-001 received and forwarded to the Sheriff's Dept. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing To Stop Harassment (CLETS) (Civil Harassment) (Restraining Order to Expire 06-23-16) filed by Moreno, Brenda on 06/24/2013. | |
June 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service (Harassment/Elder Abuse/Workplace Violence/School Violence) (Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders, Notice of court hearing, Temp Restraining Order) filed by Moreno, Brenda on 06/17/2013. | |
June 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Civil Harassment) - scheduled for 06/24/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in 36 at Ventura.
Judge: Rocky J. Baio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.