Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hartz, Cynthia Lou, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Shapiro, Andrew L., against Weaver, Janet, represented by Ivory, Robin R., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Time To Trial159 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions595 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time616 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2014 | (time estimate 5 days) | ||
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 10/24/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 22 was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - (time estimate 5 days) scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
|
November 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hartz, Cynthia Lou on 11/14/2014. | |
November 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 24, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from Weaver, Janet on 10/17/2014 | |
October 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from Hartz, Cynthia Lou on 10/14/2014 | |
October 06, 2014 |
(time estimate 5 days)
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.