Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Golden, Richard E., against Cohen, Jerry, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions202 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time248 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Capital One Bank USA NA rejected on 12/02/2013. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for Capital One Bank USA NA against Cohen, Jerry in the amount of: 16352.22 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 520.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 11/18/2013. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (re Copies) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 11/18/2013. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 11/18/2013. | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Entry of Default Judgment - CCP585 (and in Support of Order Admitting Copies into Evidence in Lieu of Originals) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 10/17/2013. | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Cohen, Jerry on Complaint. | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (of Order Admitting Copies into Evidence in Lieu of Originals) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 10/17/2013. | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 10/17/2013. | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (Does 1 to 5) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 10/17/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.