Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Liberty Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Benson, Susan M., against Tiburon Construction, City Ventures Llc, City Ventures Homebuilding Inc, represented by Vincent, Thomas L., Matsuishi, Robert T, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time751 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement voided 05/06/2014. | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Clerk and Order Thereon (vacating of case management statement) filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 05/06/2014. | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate of Clerk and Order Thereon VENTURA generated. | |
March 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Liberty Insurance Corporation on 03/24/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
August 30, 2013 | |||
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Transfered ans sent to Santa Barbara County on August 28 2013. Certified Mail receipt number 7196 9008 9111 7771 1524. | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Transfered Action to Santa Barbara COunty and Declaration of Mailing by clerk filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.