Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Nf Marina Lp, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Evans, Chris J, against Sanko, Emily, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions22 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time2082 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
July 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 07/28/2013. | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Returned with Satisfaction.) filed by NF Marina LP on 06/13/2013. | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by NF Marina LP on 05/10/2013. | |
May 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 05/10/2013. | |
May 02, 2013 | 30 Minute Time Estimate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.