Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Timen, Silvia, Timen, Alexander, Timen, Maxwell Kyler, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time751 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
May 21, 2013 | |||
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended Petition has been Granted. | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
May 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Timen, Silvia; Timen, Alexander on 05/21/2013. | |
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (April 12,19,26, May 3, 2013) filed by Timen, Alexander; Timen, Maxwell Kyler; Timen, Silvia on 05/03/2013. | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 05/21/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 was vacated. | |
April 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Amended (Order to Show cause for change of name) filed by Timen, Alexander; Timen, Silvia on 04/10/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.