Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Bramlett, Nicholas P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions219 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1266 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
August 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service submitted by Cach LLC rejected on 08/20/2013. | |
August 07, 2013 | |||
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
August 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication heard 08/07/2013 08:15:00 AM. | |
July 05, 2013 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 08/07/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
June 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Cach LLC on 06/12/2013. | |
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Cach LLC on 03/22/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.