Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vos, Ryan E, against Brown, Kathleen, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions114 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time838 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Cach LLC on 02/10/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Mandarich Law Group LLP) filed by Cach LLC on 02/06/2015. | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 10/30/2014. | |
October 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Credit 173.89; Int 309.54) filed by Cach LLC on 10/29/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals) filed by Cach LLC on 04/24/2013. | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerks Judgment) filed by Cach LLC on 04/24/2013. | |
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for Cach LLC against Brown, Kathleen in the amount of: 1651.14 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 241.00 costs, 33.30 pre-judgment interest, and 380.22 attorney fees entered on 04/24/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.