Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Desai, Vijay S., against Miller, James, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions154 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time767 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulated Settlement and Dismissal (and Entry of Judgment in the Event of Default CCP 664.6) filed by Velocity Investments LLC; Miller, James on 06/03/2013. | |
January 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 01/29/2013. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 43.
Judge: Mark S. Borrell |
|
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration/Affidavit of Venue CCP 395/396 filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 12/31/2012. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 12/31/2012. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Velocity Investments LLC on 12/31/2012. Filed By: Velocity Investments LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Miller, James(Defendant) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.