Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Miguel, Christopher A, against Silva, Anna M, represented by Higbee, Matthew K., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 28, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions349 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2715 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 06/04/2020. | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs: $60.00, Credit: $3972.99, Interest: $2474.34) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 10/17/2017. | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 10/17/2017. | |
October 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Declaration regarding computation of interest after judgment) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 10/17/2017. | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest ($0.00 Cost, $3422.99 Credit, $2344.47 Interest) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 06/27/2017. | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 06/27/2017. | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Regarding computation of interest after judgment) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 06/27/2017. | |
January 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 01/21/2015. | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 03/12/2014. | |
December 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment (and Order) filed by Unifund CCR LLC on 12/12/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.