Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Marko, Hayden Love, Haney, Kristin Lee, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Barbara A. Lane presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2012 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time905 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 25, 2013 |
Judge: Barbara A. Lane |
||
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name filed by Haney, Kristin Lee on 01/25/2013. | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
January 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence (re attempts to locate parent for Notice of Change of Name of a minor) filed by Haney, Kristin Lee on 01/24/2013. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-Day Summons & Complaint - Publication (Tri Conty Sentry Dec 7 14 21 28 2012) filed by Haney, Kristin Lee; Marko, Hayden Love on 01/02/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.