Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robinson, Shawn J, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Phillips, Carolyn C, against Evolution Motorsports Inc A Delaware Corporation, Evolution Motorsports Inc A Nevada Corporation, Evosport, Evosport Inc, Evosport Performance Center, (total of 7) See All represented by Braly, Hunt C, Witte, Melanie M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 27, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial259 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions53 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2685 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
The OSC for sanctions/dismissal re disposition of complaint in intervention, set on 9/3/19, is vacated. Dismissal of the complaint in intervention was filed on 7/19/19. The OSC for sanctions/dismissal...
Judge: Genalin Riley |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal heard 09/03/2019 08:15:00 AM. | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Complaint filed by Shawn Robinson dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court dismissal- Lack of Prosecution. | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (as to Complaint-in-Intervention filed by The Netherlands Insurance Company ONLY) filed by The Netherlands Insurance Company on 07/19/2019. | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal - re: disposition of Complaint in Intervention and disposition of complaint scheduled for 09/03/2019 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Disposition for Motorsports Operating Group LLC on Complaint vacated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.