Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cavalry Spv I Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zeller, Stephen S, against Mcgill, Kari A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions112 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1129 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC on 07/18/2013. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Int 385.00) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC on 01/10/2013. | |
January 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 01/10/2013. | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC on 07/05/2012. | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (re waiver of attorney fees) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC on 07/05/2012. | |
July 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Default entered as to McGill, Kari A on Complaint. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.