Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hartley, Alida Marie, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Loveland, Kevin Michael, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Colleen Toy White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2012 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 33 effective 01/31/2014. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 32 effective 01/22/2013. | |
February 16, 2012 | |||
January 26, 2012 | |||
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Application for Order for Reissuance of Order to Show Cause and TRO filed by Hartley, Alida Marie on 01/26/2012. | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) - scheduled for 02/16/2012 at 03:00:00 PM in 37 at Ventura. | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) continued to 02/16/2012 at 03:00 PM in department 37. | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS) (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Protection) filed by Hartley, Alida Marie on 01/06/2012. | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) - scheduled for 01/26/2012 at 03:00:00 PM in 37 at Ventura. | |
January 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 37. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.