Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Winger, Heidi Lotus, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case represented by Quin, Mary, against Winger, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Colleen Toy White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2011 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 33 effective 01/31/2014. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 32 effective 01/22/2013. | |
January 05, 2012 | |||
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
December 08, 2011 | |||
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) - scheduled for 01/05/2012 at 03:00:00 PM in 37 at Ventura. | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | The motion is granted . | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) continued to 01/05/2012 at 03:00 PM in department 37. | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | CORRECTED Notice of Hearing and Temporary Restraining Order filed. | |
November 16, 2011 | Request for Orders to Stop Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse (Temporary Restraining Order) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.