Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davis, Nita J, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Hogue, Charles H Ii, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Colleen Toy White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2011 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time867 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 33 effective 01/31/2014. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 32 effective 01/22/2013. | |
October 13, 2011 | |||
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Restraining Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse (CLETS) (EXPIRES ON 10/12/12) filed by Davis, Nita J on 10/13/2011. | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing re Temporary Restraining Order (Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse) heard 10/13/2011 03:00:00 PM. | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Orders to Stop Elder or Dependant Adult Abuse has been Granted. | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | DV-260 RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO THE SHERIFF DEPT. | |
October 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested is granted, order expires 10/12/12. | |
September 21, 2011 | Request for Order To Stop Elder Abuse |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.