Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Franzblau, Susan, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case represented by Newman, Carol L, against Trevino, Elva Perez, represented by Hohenwarter, Joseph E., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Colleen Toy White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2011 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 33 effective 01/31/2014. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 32 effective 01/22/2013. | |
October 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Trevino, Elva Perez on 10/14/2011. | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Filing of Court Order with copy of said Order Attached) filed by Trevino, Elva Perez on 10/05/2011. | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Order - Other (NO Contact) filed by Trevino, Elva Perez on 10/03/2011. | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (for Proposed Order) filed by Trevino, Elva Perez on 09/30/2011. | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Objection (Petitioner Susan H. Franzblau's Objections to (Proposed) Order submitted by Respondent Elva P. Trevino; Declaration of Susan h. Franzblau) filed by Franzblau, Susan on 09/23/2011. | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Franzblau, Susan on 09/23/2011. | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NEWMAN, CAROL L added as a effective 09/23/2011. | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging (of Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings) filed by Trevin, Elva Perez on 09/20/2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.