Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kodish, Krista Lisa, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case against Estes, William Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Colleen Toy White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2011 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time990 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 33 effective 01/31/2014. | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Kodish, Krista Lisa on 07/30/2013. | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Kristi Lisa Kodish) filed by Kodish, Krista Lisa on 07/30/2013. | |
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 32 effective 01/22/2013. | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibits destroyed. | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits generated. | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Rqst for Ord to Stop Harass/Elder abuse/ Reissue Temp Restrn Order (Dec re ExParte Ntc; Dec(s) of Ptnr & Svc Coord;Ntc of Hrg/TRO;Requ for Orders;Resp to Req) filed by Kodish, Krista Lisa on 06/17/2011. | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Rqst for Ord to Stop Harass/Elder abuse/ Reissue Temp Restrn Order (Dec re ExParte Ntc;Dec(s) of Petr & Svc Coord;Ntc of Hrg/TRO;Req for Orders:Resp to Req) filed by Kodish, Krista Lisa on 06/17/2011. | |
June 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS) served on Defendant. Copy forwarded to Sheriff for entry in CLETS filed by Kodish, Krista Lisa on 06/17/2011. | |
June 16, 2011 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.