Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan M., against Breithaup, Brian Richard, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2029 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 07/21/2015. | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Fully satisfied) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 01/16/2015. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 0.0, Credit 0.0, Interest 3035.49) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 09/30/2014. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name (and Firm Address Change) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 09/30/2014. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 09/30/2014. | |
September 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (of Interest) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 09/30/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.