Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Davis, Shedrick O, against Santillano, Steven, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions262 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1904 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 09/09/2010. | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved John Doe hisp male 50 yrs 5'7 tall 220 lbs) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 01/14/2010. | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/21/2009. | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/21/2009. Filed By: Chase Bank USA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Santillano, Steven(Defendant) | |
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/21/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.