Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Laurie, John D, against Provenzano, Mark Albert, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 02/10/2012. | |
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event | DL-30 issued. | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 06/18/2010. | |
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 05/27/2010 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by Mercury Insurance Company on 06/01/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.