Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Grosskopf, Walter, Grosskopf, Sharon, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Keep, Alfred R., against Johnston, Charles Ray, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions537 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time2921 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/24/2012. | |
June 23, 2011 | file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Conditional Settlement | ||
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause re Dismissal Pursuant to CRC 3.1385 - file dismissal on complaint pursuant to Notice of Conditional Settlement scheduled for 06/23/2011 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.