Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D., against Baez, Teresita R, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions195 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1947 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case file was destroyed on . | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/24/2012. | |
July 22, 2010 | |||
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 07/22/2010 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.