Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D., against Flores, Emiliano M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca Susan Riley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1953 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Particially Satisfied) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 04/24/2015. | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full Satisfaction) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 04/06/2015. | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 01/08/2015. | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 08/21/2014. | |
August 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 87.50; Credit 8481.19; Int 3722.32) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 08/21/2014. | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 12/31/2012. | |
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 03/16/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.