Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hilco Receivables, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Desai, Vijay S., against Murray, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions543 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1376 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Hilco Receivables, LLC on 09/24/2013. | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Returned by Law Office of Curtis O Barnes, PC) filed by Hilco Receivables, LLC on 09/06/2012. | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 09/06/2012. | |
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Hilco Receivables, LLC on 09/06/2012. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Int 157.38) filed by Hilco Receivables, LLC on 12/22/2011. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 12/22/2011. | |
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
June 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment for Hilco Receivables, LLC against Murray, Ryan in the amount of: 1582.92 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 274.00 costs, 631.16 pre-judgment interest, and 660.00 attorney fees entered on 06/14/2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.