Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hilco Receivables Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Proper, Ila M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions196 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1947 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
July 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case file was destroyed on . | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
July 22, 2010 | |||
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 07/22/2010 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM was vacated. | |
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.