Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Waterstone Property At Moorpark Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Madan, Deeksha, against Sunter, Jesse, Murray, Shannon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 18, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3278 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
July 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 07/28/2013. | |
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Fully Satisfied) filed by Waterstone Property at Moorpark LLC on 02/02/2010. | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Sunter, JesseMurray, Shannon on Complaint. | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 05-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Waterstone Property at Moorpark LLC on 12/30/2009. | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Judgment for Waterstone Property at Moorpark LLC against Murray, Shannon ;Sunter, Jesse in the amount of: 0.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 0.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 12/30/2009. | |
December 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (and Clerk's Judgment) filed by Waterstone Property at Moorpark LLC on 12/30/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.