Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Company Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Reese, Harlan M, against Garcia, Guillermina, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3734 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Notice of Renewal of Judgment; Application for and Renewal of Judgment) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/18/2019. | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Original) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/18/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Renewal of Judgment - Application for Entry filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (in support of Interest and Renewed Judgment Amount) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (as to Reese Law Group APC) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment (Endorsed Copy) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mailing (Notice of Name and Change; Declaration in Support of Interest; Memo of Costs) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
November 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (costs $0.00; Credit to Accured Interest $0.00; Credit to Principal $0.00; Accured Interest $11,892.26) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 11/06/2019. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Unsatisfied) filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC on 10/29/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.