Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Slinsky, Lourdes R, against Varner, Edward N, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
January 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 01/27/2012. | |
November 19, 2009 | Tentative Ruling |
The Court will GRANT the petition for an order confirming the arbitration award of $11,497.82, plus costs, against Respondent Edward N. Varner. (C.C.P. §§ 1285 et seq.)
Judge: David Worley |
|
November 19, 2009 | |||
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award heard 11/19/2009 08:20:00 AM. | |
November 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by FIA Card Services NA on 11/06/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.