Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Dell Financial Services, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Slinsky, Lourdes R, against Paras, Teresa M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions175 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2012 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved filed by Dell Financial Services, LLC on 10/07/2009. | |
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (395b) filed by Dell Financial Services, LLC on 08/31/2009. | |
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Dell Financial Services, LLC on 08/31/2009. | |
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint (395b) filed by Dell Financial Services, LLC on 08/31/2009. Filed By: Dell Financial Services, LLC(Plaintiff) Refers To: Paras, Teresa(Defendant) | |
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dell Financial Services, LLC on 08/31/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.