Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ayala, Abby Margo, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Bredlau, Richard R., against Qualls, Paul, Cox, Ryan, Cox, Don, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions423 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1988 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Exhibits destroyed. | |
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits generated. | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court - After Trial filed by Ayala, Abby Margo on 05/31/2011. | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment for Ayala, Abby Margo against Cox, Don ;Cox, Ryan ;Qualls, Paul in the amount of: 15000.00 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 550.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 05/31/2011. | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs (Summary) (550.00) filed by Ayala, Abby Margo on 05/31/2011. | |
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court finding. | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court - After Trial (forwarded to Judge Borrell) received from Ayala, Abby Margo on 05/26/2011 | |
February 14, 2011 | prove-up hearing | ||
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court Trial (SHC) heard 02/14/2011 08:30:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.